EP1350157 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING OPEN-PROTOCOL REMOTE DEVICE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vigilos, Inc. 2030 First Avenue, Suite 101 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDER, Bruce 13630 S. Keyport Road NE Poulsbo, WA 98370 / US | 02 /
BAHNEMAN, Liem 15764 -111th Avenue NE Bothell, WA 98011 / US | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael Barker Brettell Medina Chambers, Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01995500.4 | 06.12.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001US47846 | Priority number, date | US20000254031P | 06.12.2000 Original published format: US 254031 P | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0246901 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350157 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00, G06F17/30, G06F15/00, G05B19/418 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
G05B19/4185 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/41] | G06F3/00, G06F17/30, G06F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER FERNEINRICHTUNGSSTEUERUNG MIT OFFENEM PROTOKOLL | [2003/41] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING OPEN-PROTOCOL REMOTE DEVICE CONTROL | [2003/41] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE UNE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF ELOIGNE A PROTOCOLE OUVERT | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 28.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SEINTURIER L ET AL, "A framework for real-time communication based object oriented industrial messaging services", EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES AND FACTORY AUTOMATION, 1999. PROCEEDINGS. ETFA '99. 1999 7TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BARCELONA, SPAIN 18-21 OCT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991018), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-5670-5, pages 805 - 814, XP010365671 [X] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ETFA.1999.813076 | [A] - MATS LUNDIN, "Mätning bas för åtgärd", VERKSTÄDERNA, (20000930), no. 9, XP002327150 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5367624 (COOPER DWIGHT H [US]); | [A]US5742286 (KUNG JONATHAN SC [US], et al); | [A]US5678039 (HINKS PAUL [US], et al) |