EP1355769 - AUTOMATED MACHINE FOR SETTING FLEXIBLE NAILING POINTS ON A FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASSESE Société Anonyme, Zone Industrielle 77390 Verneuil-l'Etang / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states CASSESE Société Anonyme, Zone Industrielle 77390 Verneuil-l'Etang / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASSESE, Pierre 141, rue de la Mairie F-77720 St Ouen en Brie / FR | 02 /
CASSESE, Alain 3, Allée de la Marnière F-77720 Breau / FR | 03 /
CASSESE, Jean 83, rue de Meaux F-77390 Guines / FR | 04 /
CASSESE, Philippe 8, Les Essarts F-77950 St Germain Laxis / FR | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/44] | 01 /
CASSESE, Pierre 141, rue de la Mairie F-77720 St Ouen en Brie / FR | ||
02 /
CASSESE, Alain 3, Allée de la Marnière F-77720 Breau / FR | |||
03 /
CASSESE, Jean 3, place du Colombier, Esc. b - No 39 F-77127 Lieusaint / FR | |||
04 /
CASSESE, Philippe 8, Les Essarts F-77950 St Germain Laxis / FR | Representative(s) | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse Lepeudry et Associés 43 Rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [2009/30] |
Former [2003/44] | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse ARMENGAUD JEUNE CABINET LEPEUDRY 43, rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01995759.6 | 21.12.2001 | [2003/44] | WO2001FR04156 | Priority number, date | FR20010000298 | 11.01.2001 Original published format: FR 0100298 | [2003/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055273 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1355769 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355769 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B27F7/00 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
B27F7/006 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53039 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53061 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5307 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53478 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53522 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5377 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE MASCHINE ZUM SETZEN VON FLEXIBLEN NAGELPUNKTEN AN EINEM RAHMEN | [2003/44] | English: | AUTOMATED MACHINE FOR SETTING FLEXIBLE NAILING POINTS ON A FRAME | [2003/44] | French: | MACHINE AUTOMATIQUE A POSER DES POINTES FLEXIBLES SUR UN CADRE | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 09.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2004 | CY | 04.08.2004 | FI | 04.08.2004 | IE | 04.08.2004 | TR | 04.08.2004 | DK | 04.11.2004 | GR | 04.11.2004 | SE | 04.11.2004 | DE | 05.11.2004 | LU | 21.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 04.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CY | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
TR | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
DE | 05.11.2004 | ||
LU | 21.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
TR | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
DE | 05.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/03] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
DE | 05.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 04.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH05212704 ; | [A]JPH06238608 ; | [Y]DE4405661 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 5, lines 10-31; figure - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931203), vol. 017, no. 651, Database accession no. (M - 1519), & JP05212704 A 19930824 (MATSUDA ROJISUTEIKUSU SERVICE KK) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941124), vol. 018, no. 616, Database accession no. (M - 1710), & JP06238608 A 19940830 (KINOSHITA KOMUTEN:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |