EP1408772 - METHODS OF STABILIZING FRUIT-CONCENTRATE POWDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mann, Douglas G. 1435 East Venice Boulevard, Suite 177 Venice, FL 34292 / US | [2004/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Machtalère, Georges, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Machtalère, Georges, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2004/24] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2004/17] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn London WC2A 2AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01995995.6 | 28.11.2001 | [2004/17] | WO2001US44784 | Priority number, date | US20000253631P | 29.11.2000 Original published format: US 253631 P | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0243510 | Date: | 06.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1408772 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/212, A23L2/39, A23B7/02 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
A23B7/026 (EP,US);
A23B7/022 (EP,US);
A23B7/157 (EP,US);
A23L2/39 (EP,US);
A61K9/0007 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/10, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/032, A23V2250/5028 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/10, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/5028 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON FRUCHTKONZENTRATPULVERN | [2004/17] | English: | METHODS OF STABILIZING FRUIT-CONCENTRATE POWDERS | [2004/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE STABILISATION DE POUDRES DE CONCENTRES DE FRUITS | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 06.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/49] | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.08.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | 18.08.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.08.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.2006 | 30.11.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4664920 (SALEEB FOUAD Z [US], et al) [DX] 1-11 * column 1, line 19 - line 26 * * column 2, line 32 - line 60 * * column 3, line 5 - line 7 * * column 3, line 38 - line 41 * * column 3 - column 4; examples 1,4 *; | [X]US4477481 (EISENHARDT JR WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 10 * column 3, paragraphs 3-5 * * column 4; examples 1,2 *; | [A]GB1070060 (KELLOG CO) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 69 - line 101 * * page 4, line 75 - line 79 * * page 5; claims 1-3,5,9,10,13,15 *; | [A]US5085880 (DEVIC MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, paragraph 6 - paragraph 9 * * column 6 - column 7; claims 1,4,8-12 *; | [A]US5445839 (HAGIWARA YOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 13 - line 45 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 45 * |