EP1362275 - CONTAINER TRACKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContainerTrac, Inc. 1321 67th Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2006/06] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Carson, Robert M. 2447 17th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/47] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01996142.4 | 08.11.2001 | [2003/47] | WO2001US46825 | Priority number, date | US20000723047 | 27.11.2000 Original published format: US 723047 | [2003/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0242881 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1362275 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G06F17/60 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G01S19/49 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/47] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/47] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERVERFOLGUNGSSYSTEM | [2003/47] | English: | CONTAINER TRACKING SYSTEM | [2003/47] | French: | SYSTEME DE SUIVI DE CONTENEURS | [2003/47] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/25] | 05.02.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.02.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0748080 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US5712789 (RADICAN JOSEPH E [US]) [A] 1,5,7,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 9 *; | [X]US5780826 (HAREYAMA SOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - column 7, line 35 * * column 7, line 62 - column 13, line 6; figures 3,6 * * column 16, lines 11-54; figures 10-12 *; | [A]DE19704210 (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,7,9* the whole document *; | [X]US5959568 (WOOLLEY LOUIS A [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - column 14, line 20 *; | [A]WO0048054 (ELITE LOGISTICS SERVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 8 * | International search | [Y]US5565858 (GUTHRIE WARREN E [US]); | [YP]US6266008 (HUSTON CHARLES D [US], et al); | [YE]US2001046142 (VAN SANTEN HELMAR [NL], et al); | [YE]US2002070891 (HUSTON CHARLES [US], et al) |