EP1341797 - ORTHO SUBSTITUTED CHIRAL PHOSPHINES AND PHOSPHINITES AND THEIR USE IN ASYMMETRIC CATAYLTIC REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION 304 Old Main University Park, PA 16802 / US | [2003/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xumu 276 Camelot Lane State College, PA 16803 / US | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Neil Boyd, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Campbell, Neil Boyd, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01996543.3 | 16.11.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001US43779 | Priority number, date | US20000249537P | 17.11.2000 Original published format: US 249537 P | US20010301221P | 27.06.2001 Original published format: US 301221 P | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0240491 | Date: | 23.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1341797 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/06, C07F9/141, C07F9/50, C07F9/535, C07F9/655 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
C07F9/65848 (EP,US);
B01J31/1875 (EP,US);
B01J31/2409 (EP,US);
B01J31/2452 (EP,US);
C07B53/00 (EP,US);
C07C231/18 (EP,US);
C07C45/505 (EP,US);
C07C45/72 (EP,US);
C07C67/303 (EP,US);
C07C67/343 (EP,US);
C07F9/46 (EP,US);
C07F9/4875 (EP,US);
C07F9/4883 (EP,US);
C07F9/5027 (EP,US);
C07F9/645 (EP,US);
C07F9/65517 (EP,US);
C07F9/65522 (EP,US);
C07F9/65527 (EP,US);
C07F9/65719 (EP,US);
C07F9/65744 (EP,US);
B01J2231/643 (EP,US);
B01J2231/645 (EP,US);
B01J2531/0266 (EP,US);
B01J2531/821 (EP,US);
B01J2531/822 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US);
C07C2602/08 (EP,US);
C07C2602/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C231/18, C07C233/05 (US,EP);
C07C231/18, C07C233/06 (EP,US);
C07C231/18, C07C233/47 (EP,US);
C07C67/303, C07C69/675 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORTHOSUBSTITUIERTE CHIRALE PHOSPHINE UND PHOSPHINITE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER ASYMMETRISCHEN KATALYSE | [2003/37] | English: | ORTHO SUBSTITUTED CHIRAL PHOSPHINES AND PHOSPHINITES AND THEIR USE IN ASYMMETRIC CATAYLTIC REACTIONS | [2003/37] | French: | PHOSPHINES ET PHOSPHINITES CHIRALES SUBSTITUTEES EN ORTHO ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES REACTIONS CATALYTIQUES ASYMETRIQUES | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2003 | 30.11.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0104375 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0518241 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [Y] 1-35 * the whole document and particularly compound 13 *; | [Y]US5312996 (PACKETT DIANE L [US]) [Y] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [Y] - ZHANG Z ET AL, "Synthesis of chiral bisphosphines with tunable bite angles and their applications in asymmetric hydrogenation of beta-ketoesters", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (20000819), vol. 65, no. 19, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 6223 - 6226, XP002214812 [Y] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo000462v | [DY] - KOHEI T. ET AL., "Optically active 2,2'-bis(diphenylphosphinomethyl)-1,1'-bi-naphtyl: a new chiral bidentate phosphine ligand for transition-metal complex catalyzed asymmetric reactions", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., NL ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM., (1977), vol. 18, no. 16, pages 1389 - 1392, XP002325009 [DY] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)93051-5 | International search | [X]US5312996 (PACKETT DIANE L [US]); | EP1160237 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | [XP] - SRIGES, W. ET AL., "Method for the preparation of optically active trimethylactic acid and its esters", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS (COLUMBUS OH, USA), Database accession no. 2001:885409, XP002909218 | [A] - ZHANG ET AL., "Synthesis of chiral bisphoshines with tunable bite angles and their applications in asymmetric hydrogenation of .beta.ketoesters", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACT, COLUMBUS OH, USA, Database accession no. 2000:574233, XP002909219 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 65, no. 19, pages 6223 - 6226 |