EP1357904 - USE OF PYRAZOLO 4,3-D PYRIMIDINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/45] | USE OF PYRAZOLO 4,3-D]PYRIMIDINES | ||
[2007/46] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Change - German title | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGENWEILER, Hans-Michael Erbacher Strasse 49 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
EIERMANN, Volker Gernaienstrasse 18 63322 Rödermark / DE | [2003/45] | Application number, filing date | 01997300.7 | 29.10.2001 | [2003/45] | WO2001EP12493 | Priority number, date | DE2000158662 | 25.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10058662 | [2003/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0241880 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1357904 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 08.04.2003 | LV | 08.04.2003 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 08.04.2003 | SI | 08.04.2003 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PYRAZOLO 4,3-D PYRIMIDINEN | [2007/46] | English: | USE OF PYRAZOLO 4,3-D PYRIMIDINES | [2007/46] | French: | UTILISATION DE PYRAZOLO 4,3-D PYRIMIDINES | [2007/46] |
Former [2003/45] | VERWENDUNG VON PYRAZOLO 4,3-D]PYRIMIDINEN | ||
Former [2003/45] | USE OF PYRAZOLO 4,3-D]PYRIMIDINES | ||
Former [2003/45] | UTILISATION DE PYRAZOLO 4,3-D]PYRIMIDINES | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0579496 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * examples 5D,6B,6E,6H ** page 1, line 27 - line 38 *; | [A]US6001830 (LEE SUNG JAI [US], et al) [A] * claim 9 * * column 1, line 55 - line 63 *; | [A]US6100270 (CAMPBELL SIMON FRASER [GB]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 47 - line 63 * * claim 1 *; | [PX]WO0118004 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1,2 * page 2, line 35 - line 38 * * page 24 - page 25 * * claim 2 * * page 16, line 5 *; | [E]WO0200660 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,2 * paragraph [0002] * * claims 1,3,7 *; | [A] - CZARNIECKI M ET AL, "Inhibitors of Types I and V Phosphodiesterase: Elevation of cGMP as a Therapeutic Strategy", CONTROL AND INSTRUMENTATION, MORGAN-GRAMPIAN LTD. LONDON, GB, (1996), vol. 31, ISSN 0010-8022, pages 61 - 70, XP002180272 | [A] - DUMAITRE B ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND CYCLIC GMP PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY OF A SERIES OF 6-PHENYLPYRAZOLOU3,4-DPYRIMIDONES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1996), vol. 39, no. 8, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1635 - 1644, XP000651134 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm950812j |