EP1339890 - CYLINDRICAL TUBE FOR INDUSTRIAL CHEMICAL INSTALLATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2003/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATINLASSI, Ulf Trollvägen 34 S-802 69 Gävle / SE | 02 /
LUNDBERG, Mats Odengatan 12 S-811 34 Sandviken / SE | 03 /
ÖHNGREN, Claes Staketgatan 3 S-803 24 Gävle / SE | 04 /
ODELSTAM, Thomas Myrmalmsvägen 16 S-811 32 Sandviken / SE | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel Sandvik AB Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Taquist, Lennart Sandvik AB, Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 01997570.5 | 23.11.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001SE02602 | Priority number, date | SE20000004336 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: SE 0004336 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0242510 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1339890 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/44, C22C38/58 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
C22C30/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
F16L9/006 (EP,US);
B21B21/00 (EP,US);
B21B3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Title | German: | ZYLINDRISCHES ROHR FÜR TECHNISCHE CHEMISCHE INSTALLATIONEN | [2003/36] | English: | CYLINDRICAL TUBE FOR INDUSTRIAL CHEMICAL INSTALLATIONS | [2003/36] | French: | TUBE CYLINDRIQUE DESTINE A DES INSTALLATIONS INDUSTRIELLES CHIMIQUES | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 24.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5016460 (ENGLAND JIMMY C [US], et al); | [Y]US5126107 (DARNFORS SVEN [SE]) |