EP1342077 - METHOD FOR DETECTING MOLECULES OR CHEMICAL REACTIONS BY DETERMINING VARIATION OF CONDUCTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIDORION AB Stena Center, Holtermansgatan 1C 412 92 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states MIDORION AB Stena Center, Holtermansgatan 1C 412 92 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states MIDORION AB Vera Sandbergs Allé 8 412 96 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Sahltech I Göteborg AB Förtroligheten 7 412 70 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENERBÄCK, Sven Slätthultsliden 13A S-431 96 Mölndal / SE | 02 /
OLOFSSON, Linda Kristinehöjdsgatan 5 S-412 82 Göteborg / SE | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | ||
Former [2003/37] | Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 01997694.3 | 26.11.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001SE02616 | Priority number, date | SE20000004334 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: SE 0004334 | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0242757 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1342077 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/02, C12Q1/00, G01N33/50 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
G01N27/3278 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON MOLEKÜLEN ODER CHEMISCHER REAKTIONEN DURCH BESTIMMUNG VON LEITFÄHIGKEITSÄNDERUNGEN | [2003/37] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING MOLECULES OR CHEMICAL REACTIONS BY DETERMINING VARIATION OF CONDUCTANCE | [2003/37] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETECTEUR DES MOLECULES OU DES REACTIONS CHIMIQUES EN MESURANT LA VARIATION DE CONDUCTANCE | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 23.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5234566 (OSMAN PETER D J [AU], et al); | [X]WO9322678 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [A]FR2747785 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [X]WO9741425 (PENCE INC [CA], et al); | [X]WO9831839 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) | Examination | WO0113432 | - FELDHEIM D.L.; DOLAN KEATING C., "Self-assembly of single electron transistors and related device", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, (1998), no. 27, pages 1 - 12, XP002935020 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a827001z |