EP1342078 - SENSOR ELEMENT OF A GAS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAMER, Berndt Schellingstr. 20 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
SPRINGHORN, Carsten Elisabethenstr. 34 70197 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
HEIMANN, Detlef Untere Bergstr. 2 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 04 /
OEHLER, Gudrun Kirchtalstr. 58 70435 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
SCHUELE, Margret Besengasse 1 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | 06 /
SCHUMANN, Bernd Hegelstr. 34 71277 Rutesheim / DE | 07 /
OCHS, Thorsten Stammheimer Str. 43 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 08 /
THIEMANN-HANDLER, Sabine Heimstaetterstr. 29 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/37] | 01 /
CRAMER, Berndt Schellingstr. 20 71229 Leonberg / DE | ||
02 /
SPRINGHORN, Carsten Elisabethenstr. 34 70197 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03 /
HEIMANN, Detlef Untere Bergstr. 2 70839 Gerlingen / DE | |||
04 /
OEHLER, Gudrun Kirchtalstr. 58 70435 Stuttgart / DE | |||
05 /
SCHUELE, Margret Besengasse 1 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | |||
06 /
SCHUMANN, Bernd Daimlerstr. 23 71277 Rutesheim / DE | |||
07 /
OCHS, Thorsten Stammheimer Str. 43 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | |||
08 /
THIEMANN-HANDLER, Sabine Heimstaetterstr. 29 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01997695.0 | 20.11.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001DE04353 | Priority number, date | DE2000158014 | 23.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10058014 | [2003/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0242760 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1342078 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/419 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
G01N27/419 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORELEMENT EINES GASSENSORS | [2003/37] | English: | SENSOR ELEMENT OF A GAS SENSOR | [2003/37] | French: | ELEMENT CAPTEUR D'UN CAPTEUR DE GAZ | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/48] | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0678740 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-12,14 * column 1, lines 1-10 * * column 11, line 19 - column 13, line 16 * * column 21, lines 42-49 * * column 22, lines 3-5 * * column 24, lines 17-19 * * column 24, lines 34-37 * * column 29, lines 33-36 * * figures 2,11,12,15,17,21 *; | [X]EP0798555 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7-12,14 * column 1, lines 7,8 * * column 11, lines 15-33 * * column 14, lines 1-23 * * column 14, lines 55,56 * * column 15, lines 23-38 * * figures 2,4-6 *; | [X]US5893968 (KATO NOBUHIDE [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7-11,14 * column 1, lines 19,20 * * column 21, lines 5-15 * * column 22, lines 24-40 ** figure 9 *; | [X]EP1006354 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1-8,10-14 * column 1, lines 6-10 * * column 4, lines 17-24 * * column 5, lines 11-15 * * column 5, lines 33-43 * * column 6, lines 23-26 * * column 9, lines 41-57 * * figures 1-4 * |