EP1345273 - DUAL BIT MULTI-LEVEL BALLISTIC MONOS MEMORY, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD, PROGRAMMING, AND OPERATION PROCESS FOR THE MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALO LSI, INC. 19075 NW Tanasbourne Drive Suite 165 Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | [2007/09] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Halo LSI Design & Device Technology, Inc. 169 Myers Corners Road Wappinger Falls, NY 12590 / US | ||
For all designated states New Halo Inc. 2-24, Takaidohigashi 3-chome, Suginami-ku Tokyo 168-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGURA, Seiki 140 Old Hopewell Road Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 02 /
OGURA, Tomoko 140 Old Hopewell Road Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 03 /
HAYASHI, Yutaka 3-10, Umezono 2-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0045 / JP | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01997853.5 | 21.11.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001JP10156 | Priority number, date | JP20000354722 | 21.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000354722 | [2003/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0243158 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345273 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/28, H01L27/115, H01L29/792, H01L21/8246 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
H01L29/7923 (EP);
H10B99/00 (KR);
H01L29/40117 (EP);
H10B69/00 (EP);
H10B43/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/38] | H01L29/792, H01L21/8247 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | BALLISTISCHER DOPPELBIT-MEHREBENENMONOS-SPEICHER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMMIERUNG UND BETRIEBSPROZESS FÜR DEN SPEICHER | [2003/38] | English: | DUAL BIT MULTI-LEVEL BALLISTIC MONOS MEMORY, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD, PROGRAMMING, AND OPERATION PROCESS FOR THE MEMORY | [2003/38] | French: | MEMOIRE MONOS BALISTIQUE MULTINIVEAUX A DOUBLE BIT, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION, PROGRAMMATION ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE CETTE MEMOIRE | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2003 | Translation filed | 18.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 08.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/21] | 03.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0783180 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US5677556 (ENDOH TETSUO [JP]); | [AP]US6177318 (OGURA SEIKI [US], et al); | [XP]US6248633 (OGURA SEIKI [US], et al); | [AP]US6255166 (OGURA SEIKI [US], et al); | [AL]US2002045319 (OGURA SEIKI [US], et al); | International search | [Y]JPH05145080 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [A]JPH05326976 (ROHM CO LTD); | [AE]JP2001168219 (SONY CORP); | [YE]JP2001357681 (SONY CORP); |