EP1337847 - A LABEL-FREE HIGH-THROUGHPUT OPTICAL TECHNIQUE FOR DETECTING BIOMOLECULAR INTERACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SRU Biosystems, Inc. 14-A Gill Street Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2006/12] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Sru Biosystems, LLC 14-A Gill Street Woburn, MA 01801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUNNINGHAM, Brian, T. 23 Bedford Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 02 /
PEPPER, Jane 77 Edgelawn Avenue 11 North Andover, Massachusetts 01845 / US | 03 /
LIN, Bo 294 Bedford Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 04 /
LI, Peter 1 Copley Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | 05 /
PIEN, Homer 5 Athena Circle Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/35] | 01 /
CUNNINGHAM, Brian, T. 23 Bedford Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | ||
02 /
PEPPER, Jane 77 Edgelawn Avenue 11 North Andover, Massachusetts 01845 / US | |||
03 /
LIN, Bo 85 Williams Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | |||
04 /
LI, Peter 1 Copley Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | |||
05 /
PIEN, Homer 5 Athena Circle Andover, MA 01810 / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Savic, Bojan, et al Savic Patentanwälte Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Savic, Bojan, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Melchiorstraße 42 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/35] | Nobbe, Matthias, Dr. Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01998024.2 | 23.10.2001 | [2003/35] | WO2001US45455 | Priority number, date | US20000244312P | 30.10.2000 Original published format: US 244312 P | US20010283314P | 12.04.2001 Original published format: US 283314 P | US20010303028P | 03.07.2001 Original published format: US 303028 P | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02061429 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1337847 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
B01L3/5085 (EP,US);
G01N21/253 (EP,US);
G01N21/4788 (EP,US);
G01N21/7743 (EP,US);
G02B5/1809 (EP,US);
Y10T436/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCH-DURCHSATZ OPTISCHES VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON BIOMOLEKULAREN WECHSELWIRKUNGEN | [2003/35] | English: | A LABEL-FREE HIGH-THROUGHPUT OPTICAL TECHNIQUE FOR DETECTING BIOMOLECULAR INTERACTIONS | [2003/35] | French: | TECHNIQUE OPTIQUE A RENDEMENT ELEVE SANS MARQUEUR PERMETTANT DE DETECTER DES INTERACTIONS BIOMOLECULAIRES | [2003/35] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.10.2013 | 29.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/07] | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/07] | Appeal following examination | 30.12.2013 | Appeal received No. T0620/14 | 03.03.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.01.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP07118355.2 / EP1892518 | EP10185633.4 / EP2402739 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2013 | 31.10.2013 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2014 | 31.10.2014 | 14   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | US4009933 | US5478527 | US5598300 | US5738825 | WO9909396 | US6035089 |