|
24.09.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.11.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.07.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.08.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |