16.02.2018 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
01.11.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
20.10.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
16.06.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
10.03.2017 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
14.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
08.02.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
02.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
01.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
05.08.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
22.07.2016 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
22.07.2016 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
28.10.2015 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
11.08.2015 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
10.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
23.04.2015 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
05.04.2015 |
Opposition filed |
published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
17.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
20.06.2014 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
16.05.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
12.05.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.05.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.05.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.02.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.02.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
20.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2013 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
18.01.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
07.12.2012 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
16.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.06.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.02.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
16.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.09.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2009 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
21.08.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
21.08.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
24.03.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.01.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
31.01.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.07.2006 |
First examination report |
|
13.07.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2005 |
First examination report |
|
16.02.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
30.01.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
05.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] |
18.07.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] |
10.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|