EP1339366 - VACUUM THERAPY AND CLEANSING DRESSING FOR WOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KCI Medical Resources Zephyr House 122 Mary Street Grand Cayman / KY | [2014/25] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states KCI Medical Resources Zephyr House 122 Mary Street Grand Cayman / KY | ||
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006-9167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOCKWOOD, Jeffrey, S. 500 North Walnut Batesville, IN 47006 / US | 02 /
PETROSENKO, Robert 30 Belmont Place West Batesville, IN 47006 / US | 03 /
RISK, James, Robert, Jr. 10861 N. Private Road 23 W. Fountaintown, IN 46130 / US | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cordina, Kevin John, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2012/13] | Ashton, Timothy, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Ashton, Timothy, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2003/36] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01998292.5 | 27.11.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001US44194 | Priority number, date | US20000725352 | 29.11.2000 Original published format: US 725352 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0243634 | Date: | 06.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1339366 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1339366 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
A61M27/00 (EP,US);
A61F13/05 (EP,US);
A61M1/77 (EP,US);
A61M1/915 (EP,US);
A61M1/92 (EP,US);
A61M1/772 (EP,US);
A61M1/84 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Title | German: | VAKUUMBEHANDLUNG UND REINIGUNGSVERBAND FÜR WUNDEN | [2003/36] | English: | VACUUM THERAPY AND CLEANSING DRESSING FOR WOUNDS | [2003/36] | French: | THERAPIE PAR LE VIDE ET PANSEMENT DE NETTOYAGE DESTINE A DES PLAIES | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2009 | Observations by third parties | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Observations by third parties | 14.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14172371.8 / EP2801388 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2005 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2015
27.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE Smith and Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US Opponent's representative HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2015
27.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE Smith and Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US Opponent's representative HGF Limited 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | ||
Former [2015/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.2015
27.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE Smith and Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US Opponent's representative Dixon, Philip Matthew HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | 23.04.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.10.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 08.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 02.11.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 12.11.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.06.2014 | BE | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | ES | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | NL | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | IE | 27.11.2014 | LU | 27.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | [2015/46] |
Former [2015/33] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 27.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US4969880 (ZAMIEROWSKI DAVID S [US]) [XD] 1-4,6,7,25-39 * column 8, line 3 - line 6; figure 10 *; | [XA]US5549584 (GROSS JAMES R [US]) [X] 1-8,12,25-39 * column 5, line 16 - line 31 * * column 7, line 27 - line 37; figure 4 * [A] 15,24; | [DX]US5636643 (ARGENTA LOUIS C [US], et al) [DX] 1-4,6,7,25-39 * column 10, line 5 - line 7 * * column 6, line 7 * * column 5, line 44 * * figures 2,10,11 *; | [X]EP0880953 (FLEISCHMANN WILHELM DR MED [DE]) [X] 40 * column 5, line 22 - line 26 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 8 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2333965 (KCI MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [A] 5 * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 3 *; | [AD]WO0007653 (HILL ROM CO INC [US], et al) [AD] 1,25,36,40 * page 14, line 5 - line 23 * * page 15, line 28 - line 32 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]WO0042958 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-8,12,25-39 * page 16, paragraph 2; figure 6J * * page 20, line 8 - line 10; figure 7A *; | [PXD]WO0137922 (HENLEY ALAN WAYNE [US], et al) [PXD] 1-4,6,7,25-39* page 15, paragraph 2; figure 9 * | by applicant | US4969880 | US5298015 | US5358494 | US5636643 | US5645081 | US6071304 | US6080189 | US6095992 | other | US5549584 | US5636643 |