EP1339396 - MAGNETIC PARTICLES FOR THE TARGETED REGIONAL THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alexiou, Christoph Elisabethstrasse 8 80796 München / DE | For all designated states Bergemann, Christian Bamberger Strasse 51 10777 Berlin 31 / DE | [2003/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01998333.7 | 28.11.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001EP13926 | Priority number, date | DE2000159151 | 29.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10059151 | [2003/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0243708 | Date: | 06.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1339396 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, A61K47/48, A61P35/00 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
A61K47/6923 (EP);
A61K9/0009 (EP);
A61K9/5115 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE PARTIKEL ZUR ZIELGERICHTETEN REGIONALEN THERAPIE | [2003/36] | English: | MAGNETIC PARTICLES FOR THE TARGETED REGIONAL THERAPY | [2003/36] | French: | PARTICULES MAGN TIQUES POUR TH RAPIES LOCALES CIBL ES | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 20.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/33] | 23.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]DE19624426 (BERGEMANN CHRISTIAN [DE]) [XD] 1-17 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 1 *; | [X]US5928958 (PILGRIMM HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0156546 (UNIV FLORIDA STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [PX] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PX] - ALEXIOU CHRISTOPH ET AL, "Locoregional cancer treatment with magnetic drug targeting.", CANCER RESEARCH, (20001201), vol. 60, no. 23, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 6641 - 6648, XP001063184 [PX] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - ALEXIOU C ET AL, "Magnetic mitoxantrone nanoparticle detection by histology, X-ray and MRI after magnetic tumor targeting", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (2001), vol. 225, no. 1-2, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 187 - 193, XP004234944 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-8853(00)01256-7 | [X] - LUBBE A S ET AL, "Physiological aspects in magnetic drug-targeting", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199904), vol. 194, no. 1-3, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 149 - 155, XP004166660 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-8853(98)00574-5 | [X] - ALEXIOU CHRISTOPH ET AL, "Magnetic drug targeting: An interdisciplinary method in treatment of cancer.", EUROPEAN BIOPHYSICS JOURNAL, 3rd European Biophysics Congress;Munchen, Germany; September 09-13, 2000, (2000), vol. 29, no. 4-5, ISSN 0175-7571, page 364, XP001068473 [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [X] - GUPTA P K ET AL, "MAGNETICALLY CONTROLLED TARGETED MICRO-CARRIER SYSTEMS", LIFE SCIENCES, (1989), vol. 44, no. 3, ISSN 0024-3205, pages 175 - 186, XP002197845 [X] 1-17 * page 175, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0024-3205(89)90593-6 | [X] - GUPTA P K ET AL, "TARGETED DELIVERY OF LOW DOSE DOXORUBICIN HYDROCHLORIDE ADMINISTERED VIA MAGNETIC ALBUMIN MICROSPHERES IN RATS", JOURNAL OF MICROENCAPSULATION, (1990), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 0265-2048, pages 85 - 94, XP002197846 [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [X] - PULFER S K; GALLO J M, "Enhanced brain tumor selectivity of cationic magnetic polysaccharide microspheres", JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, (1998), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 215 - 227, XP002197847 [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [X] - PULFER S K; CICCOTTO S L; GALLO J M, "Distribution of small magnetic particles in brain tumor-bearing rats.", JOURNAL OF NEURO-ONCOLOGY, (199901), vol. 41, no. 2, pages 99 - 105, XP002197848 [X] 1-17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006137523591 |