EP1352280 - CLOSED SPACE FOR OPTICAL FIBRE CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SJÖLIN, Kaj Steg 7218 S-824 94 Hudiksvall / SE | 02 /
ALEXANDERSSON, Robert Laduvägen 13 S-824 40 Hudviksvall / SE | 03 /
FORSLUND, Hasse Tallvägen 19 S-854 66 Sundsvall / SE | 04 /
ISACSSON, Mans Arne Hällebäcksvägen 74 444 44 STENUNGSUND / SE | 05 /
NILSEN, Wiggo Gammelsträng S-820 69 Näsviken / SE | 06 /
JONSSON, Sam Hedsta 2055 S-820 65 Forsa / SE | 07 /
PAULSSON, Niklas Nygatan 19 S-825 32 Iggesund / SE | 08 /
JÖRGENSEN, Joakim Anöviken 54 SE - 824 93 HUDIKSVALL / SE | [2004/09] |
Former [2003/42] | 01 /
SJÖLIN, Kaj Steg 7218 S-824 94 Hudiksvall / SE | ||
02 /
ALEXANDERSSON, Robert Laduvägen 13 S-824 40 Hudviksvall / SE | |||
03 /
FORSLUND, Hasse Tallvägen 19 S-854 66 Sundsvall / SE | |||
04 /
ISACSSON, M ns Blocksvägen 37 C S-824 34 Hudiksvall / SE | |||
05 /
NILSEN, Wiggo Gammelsträng S-820 69 Näsviken / SE | |||
06 /
JONSSON, Sam Hedsta 2055 S-820 65 Forsa / SE | |||
07 /
PAULSSON, Niklas Nygatan 19 S-825 32 Iggesund / SE | |||
08 /
JÖRGENSEN, Joakim Björnbergsvägen 35 S-824 51 Hudiksvall / SE | Representative(s) | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Älvsjö Box 1505 125 25 Älvsjö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Älvsjö Box 1505 125 25 Älvsjö / SE | ||
Former [2005/17] | Norin, Klas Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Kista 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/42] | Lövgren, Tage, et al Telefon AB L M Ericsson, Licensing & Patent Development 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01998859.1 | 26.11.2001 | [2003/42] | WO2001SE02609 | Priority number, date | SE20000004394 | 29.11.2000 Original published format: SE 0004394 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0244784 | Date: | 06.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352280 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
G02B6/4458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHLOSSENER RAUM FÜR FASEROPTISCHE VERBINDUNG | [2003/42] | English: | CLOSED SPACE FOR OPTICAL FIBRE CONNECTION | [2003/42] | French: | ESPACE FERME POUR CONNEXION DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 06.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 07.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS62295008 ; | [X]US4767173 (PRIAROGGIA PAOLO G [IT]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP62295008 A 19871222 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) |