EP1346549 - INTERCOMMUNICATION PREPROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | For:LU
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For:AT
BE
CH
LI
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | ||
For:LU
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAIGER, Dieter, Ernst Falkenstrasse 28 71093 Weil im Schönbuch / DE | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Duscher, Reinhard IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Duscher, Reinhard IBM Deutschland GmbH Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | ||
Former [2003/39] | Duscher, Reinhard, Dr. IBM Deutschland GmbH, Intellectual Property, Pascalstrasse 100 70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01999208.0 | 27.10.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001EP12470 | Priority number, date | EP20000127047 | 09.12.2000 Original published format: EP 00127047 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0247355 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346549 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1346549 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
H04L49/901 (EP,US);
H04L65/00 (KR);
H04L49/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERKOMMUNIKATIONSVORPROZESSOR | [2003/39] | English: | INTERCOMMUNICATION PREPROCESSOR | [2003/39] | French: | PREPROCESSEUR D'INTERCOMMUNICATIONS | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 18.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2005 | BE | 23.02.2005 | CH | 23.02.2005 | FI | 23.02.2005 | LI | 23.02.2005 | NL | 23.02.2005 | TR | 23.02.2005 | DK | 23.05.2005 | GR | 23.05.2005 | SE | 23.05.2005 | ES | 03.06.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | CY | 27.10.2005 | IE | 27.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
TR | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 27.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
TR | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 27.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 27.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.02.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4625308 (KIM KAP S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,14,16 * column 76, line 46 - line 61 * * column 77, line 65 - column 78, line 21 * * column 84, line 52 - column 86, line 16 * * column 100, line 38 - line 43 * [A] 3,8,9,11,15; | [A]US5153909 (BECKLE LEANN M [US], et al) [A] 1,10,14 * column 2, line 23 - line 56 ** column 8, line 55 - column 10, line 22 * |