EP1339837 - PROLYL ENDOPROTEASE FROM ASPERGILLUS NIGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Koninklijke DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEKKER, Petrus, Jacobus, Theodorus Vonkstraat 2 NL-2497 AE Den Haag / NL | 02 /
VAN DER HOEVEN, Robertus, Antonius, Mijndert Kerkstraat 6a NL-2223 AJ KATWIJK / NL | 03 /
EDENS, Luppo Hoflaan 118 NL-3062 JL ROTTERDAM / NL | 04 /
DE LANGE, Linda Zijdeweg 4 NL-2804 ML GOUDA / NL | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Matulewicz, Emil Rudolf Antonius, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Matulewicz, Emil Rudolf Antonius, et al DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office - PP 600-0240 P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | ||
Former [2004/24] | Matulewicz, Emil Rudolf Antonius, et al DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office PP 600-0240 P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | ||
Former [2003/36] | Matulewicz, Emil Rudolf Antonius DSM Intellectual Property, Delft Office, P.O. Box 1 (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 01999290.8 | 06.12.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001EP14480 | Priority number, date | EP20000204404 | 07.12.2000 Original published format: EP 00204404 | EP20010204464 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: EP 01204464 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0245524 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1339837 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1339837 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/62, C12N15/57, C12N1/20, A23K1/16 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
G01N33/573 (EP,US);
A23J3/34 (KR);
A23J3/16 (EP,US);
A23J3/343 (EP,US);
A23J3/344 (EP,US);
A23J3/346 (EP,US);
A23L2/02 (EP,US);
A23L2/84 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
C12H1/003 (EP,US);
C12Q1/37 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/36] | C12N9/62, C12N15/57, C12N1/20, A23K1/16, // C12R1:685 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Extension states | AL | 10.06.2003 | LT | 10.06.2003 | LV | 10.06.2003 | MK | 10.06.2003 | RO | 10.06.2003 | SI | 10.06.2003 | Title | German: | PROLYLENDOPROTEASE AUS ASPERGILLUS NIGER | [2003/36] | English: | PROLYL ENDOPROTEASE FROM ASPERGILLUS NIGER | [2003/36] | French: | PROLYLENDOPROTEASE OBTENUE DE ASPERGILLUS NIGER | [2003/36] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 19.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2008 | BE | 13.02.2008 | CY | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0522428 (VANDEMOORTELE INT NV [BE]) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [X] - "A. niger cDNA clone 2599", EMBL, EBI, (20000920), Database accession no. BE759716, XP002203451 [X] 6-11 * abstract * |