EP1349525 - AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE SUCH AS A SANITARY NAPKIN, A DIAPER, AN INCONTINENCE GUARD, OR A PANTY-LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2004/02] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products 405 03 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREVIK, Solgun Hulebäcksvägen 16 S-435 35 Mölnlycke / SE | 02 /
ASP, Fredrik Boklundsvägen 5 S-439 35 Onsala / SE | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Romare, Laila Anette, et al Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Romare, Laila Anette, et al Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 01999337.7 | 23.11.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001SE02589 | Priority number, date | SE20000004496 | 06.12.2000 Original published format: SE 0004496 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0245637 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1349525 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349525 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/475 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
A61F13/47245 (EP);
A61F13/475 (KR);
A61F13/47272 (EP);
A61F13/4758 (EP);
A61F13/476 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL, Z.B. DAMENBINDE, WINDEL, INKONTINENZSCHUTZ ODER SLIP-EINLAGE | [2003/41] | English: | AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE SUCH AS A SANITARY NAPKIN, A DIAPER, AN INCONTINENCE GUARD, OR A PANTY-LINER | [2003/41] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBENT TEL QUE SERVIETTE HYGIENIQUE, COUCHE, PROTECTION CONTRE L'INCONTINENCE, OU PROTEGE-SLIP | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 26.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2005 | CH | 13.04.2005 | FI | 13.04.2005 | LI | 13.04.2005 | TR | 13.04.2005 | DK | 13.07.2005 | GR | 13.07.2005 | PT | 13.09.2005 | CY | 23.11.2005 | IE | 23.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2009/42] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
CY | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 13.04.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0136524 (ZENMI CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0302523 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | [A]US5514104 (COLE ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]WO9925282 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE], et al); | [A]EP0965318 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE]) |