EP1339693 - DIAMINOPYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR OXIDATION DYEING OF KERATINOUS FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FESSMANN, Thilo 24, rue Emile Volpati F-93600 Aulnay Sous Bois / FR | 02 /
TERRANOVA, Eric 102, avenue de la Bastide F-06520 Magagnosc / FR | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01999561.2 | 29.11.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001FR03778 | Priority number, date | FR20000015837 | 06.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0015837 | [2003/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0246165 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1339693 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/38, A61K7/13, C07D403/06, C07D405/06 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
C07D231/38 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAMINOPYRAZOLDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG FÜR DIE OXIDATIVE FÄRBUNG VON KERATINFASERN | [2003/36] | English: | DIAMINOPYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR OXIDATION DYEING OF KERATINOUS FIBRES | [2003/36] | French: | DERIVES DE DIAMINOPYRAZOLE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TEINTURE D'OXYDATION DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0043367 (OREAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 3, lines 8,9; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9634591 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-20 * claim 1 *; | [X]DE20013156U (WELLA AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9408970 (WELLA AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,5 * claim - *; | [AD]DE4234885 (WELLA AG [DE]) [AD] 1,5 * claim - * |