EP1392936 - WOOD BOARD FLOOR ON EXTERNAL TERRACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baranowski, Grzegorz ul. Abrahama 48 PL-80-307 Gdansk-Oliwa / PL | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Pomianek, Grazyna Ul. Pulaskiego 11/2 81-760 Sopot / PL | [2007/29] |
Former [2007/29] | Volekova, Eva Salviova 18 821 01 Bratislava / SK | Application number, filing date | 01999713.9 | 03.12.2001 | [2004/10] | WO2001PL00096 | Priority number, date | PL20000344316 | 04.12.2000 Original published format: PL 34431600 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0246546 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1392936 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1392936 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/00 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
E04F15/04 (EP,US);
E04B5/12 (EP,US);
E04F2015/02072 (EP,US);
E04F2201/042 (EP,US);
E04F2201/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOLZPLATTENBODEN AUF AUSSENTERRASSEN | [2004/10] | English: | WOOD BOARD FLOOR ON EXTERNAL TERRACES | [2004/10] | French: | PLANCHER A PANNEAUX EN BOIS POUR TERRASSES EXTERIEURES | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.08.2003 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | 26.08.2003 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   05.11.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.02.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2006 | 31.12.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.04.2008 | BE | 30.04.2008 | CY | 30.04.2008 | DK | 30.04.2008 | FI | 30.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | NL | 30.04.2008 | TR | 30.04.2008 | GR | 31.07.2008 | SE | 31.07.2008 | ES | 10.08.2008 | PT | 30.09.2008 | IE | 03.12.2008 | LU | 03.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CY | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
TR | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CY | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 10.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5148644 (WEIR RANDY S [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 23 - column 6, line 60; figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO9401632 (NYSTROM RON [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract; page 10, line 20 - line 26; figure 6 *; | [A]DE4443712 (BAIKER ROBERT [DE]); | [X]US6108992 (SHAW JOHN G [CA]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 65; figures 1,2,6,7 * |