Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4364469B | Global Dossier | 18.11.2009 | B2 | JP2002238025 | 23.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000369521 | 05.12.2000 | JP2001364464 | 29.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1343168 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2006 | A4 | EP1343168 | 10.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000369521 | 05.12.2000 | JP0110595 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0247086 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000369521 | 05.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100378862C | 02.04.2008 | C | CN1397075 | 12.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000369521 | 05.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7177531 | 13.02.2007 | B2 | US2002094191 | 18.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000369521 | 05.12.2000 |