EP1343168 - RECORDING/REPRODUCING APPARATUS AND RECORD MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIE, Masahiro 4-4-8 Seta, Wagi-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740-0062 / JP | 02 /
NINOMIYA, Masako 8-18, Nakahiro-cho 3-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 733-0012 / JP | 03 /
HORI, Ryuichi 7-4, Nakayamaue 2-chome, Higashi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 732-0027 / JP | 04 /
OKAMOTO, Shuji 17-27, Yamate 1-chome Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737-0814 / JP | 05 /
HASHIMOTO, Atsushi 2-7-1007, Higashiyama Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1114 / JP | [2003/50] |
Former [2003/37] | 01 /
HORIE, Masahiro 5-2-102, Seta 2-chome, Wagi-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740-0062 / JP | ||
02 /
NINOMIYA, Masako 8-18, Nakahiro-cho 3-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 733-0012 / JP | |||
03 /
HORI, Ryuichi 7-4, Nakayamaue 2-chome, Higashi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 732-0027 / JP | |||
04 /
OKAMOTO, Shuji 17-27, Yamate 1-chome Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737-0814 / JP | |||
05 /
HASHIMOTO, Atsushi 2-7-1007, Higashiyama Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1114 / JP | Representative(s) | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01999942.4 | 04.12.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001JP10595 | Priority number, date | JP20000369521 | 05.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000369521 | [2003/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0247086 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1343168 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/34, G11B27/10, G11B27/034, G11B27/28, G11B33/10, H04N5/76 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2575 (EP,US);
G11B33/10 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/37] | G11B27/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/37] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGS/WIEDERGABEGERAET UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2003/37] | English: | RECORDING/REPRODUCING APPARATUS AND RECORD MEDIUM | [2003/37] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT / REPRODUCTION ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2002 | Translation filed | 12.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/16] | 06.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/16] | 26.11.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH11297051 ; | [YA]JPH1139850 ; | [Y]US5546191 (HIBI TAKETOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 9, line 33 - column 10, line 36 * * column 25, line 27 - line 48; figure 18 *; | [L]US6385386 (AOTAKE HIDENORI [JP]) [L] * column W * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11297051 A 19991029 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,2,5,6,9-12,19,20 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,7,8 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11039850 A 19990212 (SONY CORP) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * [A] 1,2,4-6,9-20 | International search | [X]JPH11297051 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH11213628 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH08138318 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP3001102B ; | [Y]JPH08182066 (SONY CORP) | Examination | US5697885 | by applicant | JPH11297051 | US5546191 | JPH1139850 | US5697885 | JPH08182066 |