EP1340238 - HYBRID ELECTRICAL SWITCHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Electric B.V. Europalaan 202 7559 SC Hengelo / NL | [2006/44] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Eaton Electric N.V. Europalaan 202 7559 SC Hengelo / NL | ||
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Holec Holland N.V. Europalaan 202 7559 SC Hengelo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHASFOORT, Petrus, Johannes, Plechelmus Geelster 11 NL-7577 GE Oldenzaal / NL | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01999950.7 | 04.12.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001NL00881 | Priority number, date | NL20001016791 | 04.12.2000 Original published format: NL 1016791 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0247100 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1340238 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1340238 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/54 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
H01H9/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Extension states | AL | 28.05.2003 | LT | 28.05.2003 | LV | 28.05.2003 | MK | 28.05.2003 | RO | 28.05.2003 | SI | 28.05.2003 | Title | German: | HYBRIDE ELEKTRISCHE SCHALTEINRICHTUNG | [2003/36] | English: | HYBRID ELECTRICAL SWITCHING DEVICE | [2003/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION ELECTRIQUE HYBRIDE | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 27.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2006 | CH | 22.11.2006 | CY | 22.11.2006 | IT | 22.11.2006 | LI | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | IE | 04.12.2006 | LU | 04.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | GR | 23.02.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
TR | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 04.12.2006 | ||
LU | 04.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 04.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 04.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 22.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01313817 ; | [X]US4876498 (LUCHACO DAVID G [US], et al) [X] 16,19,20 * column 10, line 24 - line 40; figure 10 *; | [XY]GB2284100 (CARADON MK ELECTRIC LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,15-18 * page 20, line 10 - page 26, line 15; figure 4 * [Y] 10-12,19,20; | [A]EP0806781 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA [FR]) [A] 20* the whole document *; | [Y]US5699218 (KADAH ANDREW S [US]) [Y] 10 * column 4, line 45 - line 60; figure 4 *; | [YA]US5818710 (LEVAN SUU MAURICE [FR]) [Y] 11,12,19,20 * column 1, line 14 - line 36 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 6 * * column 4, line 13 - line 24; figure - * [A] 4,13-15; | [X]FR2772975 (CROUZET AUTOMATISMES [FR]) [X] 1,6-9,16 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900305), vol. 014, no. 117, Database accession no. (E - 0898), & JP01313817 A 19891219 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 5 * abstract * |