EP1223384 - Locking device for fire door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPARTHERM Feuerungstechnik GmbH Maschweg 38 49324 Melle / DE | [2004/14] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states DCA Deckert Anlagenbau GmbH Theodor-Marwitz-Strasse 7 21337 Lüneburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Mertens- Kachelöfen und Fliesen GmbH Lüneburger Strasse 104 21423 Winsen/Luhe / DE | |||
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Deckert Maschinenbau GmbH Theodor-Marwitz-Strasse 7 21337 Lüneburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Mertens- Kachelöfen und Fliesen GmbH Lüneburger Strasse 104 21423 Winsen/Luhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saemann, Ernst-Otto Am Försterholz 13 21401 Thomasburg / DE | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Jochen Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen Eisenbahnstraße 5 21680 Stade / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Hansen, Jochen Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen, Eisenbahnstrasse 5 21680 Stade / DE | Application number, filing date | 02000228.3 | 11.01.2002 | [2002/29] | Priority number, date | DE20011001246 | 12.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10101246 | [2002/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1223384 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1223384 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24B13/00 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
F24B13/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/29] | Extension states | LT | 11.01.2003 | SI | 11.01.2003 | Title | German: | Feuerraumtürschliesseinrichtung | [2002/29] | English: | Locking device for fire door | [2002/29] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture pour porte de foyer | [2002/29] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.05.2003 | IE | 02.05.2003 | TR | 02.05.2003 | GR | 02.08.2003 | PT | 04.08.2003 | ES | 13.08.2003 | LU | 11.01.2004 | BE | 31.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/52] | IE | 02.05.2003 | |
TR | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
LU | 11.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | IE | 02.05.2003 | |
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
LU | 11.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | IE | 02.05.2003 | |
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | IE | 02.05.2003 | |
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/15] | IE | 02.05.2003 | |
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GR | 02.08.2003 | |
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 02.08.2003 | |
PT | 04.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0187220 (NOWO NOTTROTT & WOLF [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DA]DE8708165U (RIENER) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - * |