03.11.2017 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
14.08.2009 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
19.09.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
12.10.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
14.09.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
29.08.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.08.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.05.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
06.04.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
05.04.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
05.01.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
19.09.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
05.09.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
28.06.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] |
27.12.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
31.05.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] |