Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100608478B | Global Dossier | 09.08.2006 | B1 | KR20020061519 | 24.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001007050 | 15.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4031204B | Global Dossier | 09.01.2008 | B2 | JP2002216555 | 02.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001007050 | 15.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1223590 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2007 | B1 | EP1223590 | 05.02.2003 | A3 | EP1223590 | 17.07.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001007050 | 15.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1224060C | 19.10.2005 | C | CN1366310 | 28.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001007050 | 15.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60223426T | 02.10.2008 | T2 | DE60223426D1 | 27.12.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001007050 | 15.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1223590T | 11.02.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001007050 | 15.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6718618 | 13.04.2004 | B2 | US2002148101 | 17.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001007050 | 15.01.2001 |