EP1223590 - Method of manufacturing superconducting cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY 1-1-3, Uchisaiwai-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY 1-1-3, Uchisaiwai-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | |||
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | ||
For all designated states The Tokyo Electric Power Co., Inc. 1-3, Uchisaiwai-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirose, Masayuki, Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. Osaka Works, 1-1, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Masuda, Takato, Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. Osaka Works, 1-1, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Kato, Takeshi, Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. Osaka Works, 1-1, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Yoshihisa, Electric Power Eng. R&D Center Tokyo Electric Power Company, 4-1, Egasaki-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Matsuo, Kimiyoshi, Electric Power Eng. R&D Center Tokyo Electric Power Company, 4-1, Egasaki-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Honjo, Shoichi, Electric Power Eng. R&D Center Tokyo Electric Power Company, 4-1, Egasaki-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 07 /
Mimura, Tomoo, Electric Power Eng. R&D Center Tokyo Electric Power Company, 4-1, Egasaki-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 08 /
Aiba, Terumitsu, Electric Power Eng. R&D Center Tokyo Electric Power Company, 4-1, Egasaki-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2007/19] |
Former [2002/29] | 01 /
Hirose, Masayuki, Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. Osaka Works, 1-1, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Masuda, Takato, Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. Osaka Works, 1-1, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Kato, Takeshi, Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. Osaka Works, 1-1, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
04 /
Takahashi, Yoshihisa, Electric Power Eng. R&D Cent Tokyo Electric Power Company, 4-1, Egasaki-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
05 /
Matsuo, Kimiyoshi, Electric Power Eng. R&D Center Tokyo Electric Power Company, 4-1, Egasaki-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
06 /
Honjo, Shoichi, Electric Power Eng. R&D Center Tokyo Electric Power Company, 4-1, Egasaki-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
07 /
Mimura, Tomoo, Electric Power Eng. R&D Center Tokyo Electric Power Company, 4-1, Egasaki-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
08 /
Aiba, Terumitsu, Electric Power Eng. R&D Center Tokyo Electric Power Company, 4-1, Egasaki-cho Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/45] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2002/29] | Moutard, Pascal Jean, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, Postfach 15 04 27 80043 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02000235.8 | 14.01.2002 | [2002/29] | Priority number, date | JP20010007050 | 15.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001007050 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1223590 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1223590 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1223590 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01B13/02 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
H01B12/02 (EP,US);
H01B12/00 (KR);
H01B13/02 (EP,US);
Y02E40/60 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/43] |
Former [2002/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für supraleitendes Kabel | [2002/29] | English: | Method of manufacturing superconducting cable | [2002/29] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un câble supraconducteur | [2002/29] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 12.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2009/38] | deleted | ||
Former [2009/23] | FR | 31.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH09134620 ; | [A]US3604833 (BECK AUGUST) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 47 - column 6, line 39; figures 1-7 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09134620 A 19970520 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD;TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO INC:THE) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * |