EP1217082 - Method of blowing synthetic resin into furnace and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Hiromi, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 02 /
Okochi, Iwao, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 03 /
Fujii, Mitsuhiro, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 04 /
Yamaguchi, Atsushi, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 05 /
Asanuma, Minoru, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 06 /
Ariyama, Tatsuro, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 07 /
Sato, Michitaka, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 08 /
Murai, Ryota, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 09 /
Nagaoka, Tsuneo, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 10 /
Akashi, Tetsuo, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 11 /
Tezuka, Kenichi, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 12 /
Asakawa, Yukihiko, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 13 /
Tomioka, Koichi, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 14 /
Ishiguro, Hiroki, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 15 /
Yamada, Yutaka, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 16 /
Wakimoto, Kazumasa, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 17 /
Tsukiji, Hideaki, Intellectual Property Dept. NKK Corporation, 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02000238.2 | 17.03.1997 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | JP19960243923 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24392396 | JP19960265139 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: JP 26513996 | JP19960243924 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24392496 | JP19960243921 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24392196 | JP19960337023 | 17.12.1996 Original published format: JP 33702396 | JP19970027581 | 12.02.1997 Original published format: JP 2758197 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217082 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1217082 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C21B5/02, C21B13/00, C08J3/12 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
B29B17/0412 (EP,US);
C21B5/02 (KR);
B29B17/0026 (EP,US);
C21B13/0066 (EP,US);
C21B5/023 (EP,US);
C21B5/026 (EP,US);
B29B2017/044 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0496 (EP,US);
B29L2007/00 (EP,US);
Y02P10/134 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US);
Y02W30/52 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/26] | C21B5/02, C21B13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einblasen von Kunststoff in einem Ofen | [2002/26] | English: | Method of blowing synthetic resin into furnace and apparatus therefor | [2002/26] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'injection de résine synthétique dans un four | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 11.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/18] | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97104513.3 / EP0829544 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59172594 ; | [A]JPH04180878 ; | [A]EP0193666 (MATSUZAKI TSUTOMU) [A] 1,2* page 1, paragraph 2; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [YA]US5100605 (BARTLET PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * column 1, line 1 - line 21 * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 8 * * column 8, line 39 - line 57; claim 1 * [A] 3-6; | [YD]EP0622465 (KLOECKNER STAHL GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1,2,7,8 * figure 1; claims 1,4 *; | [YA]DE4402025 (EKO STAHL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 56; claims 1-4 * [A] 3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850206), vol. 009, no. 028, Database accession no. (C - 264), & JP59172594 A 19840929 (TOUKAI NENKEN KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP04180878 A 19920629 (YOSHIDA TOSHIO) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |