EP1234775 - Carton for a substantially flat article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brakemann Verpackungen GmbH & Co.KG Maschbruchstrasse 27 32257 Bünde / DE | [2006/24] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Brakemann Verpackungen GmbH & Co.KG Maschbruchstrasse 27 32257 Bünde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brakemann, Jörg Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 36 32257 Bünde / DE | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Specht, Peter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Loesenbeck, Stracke, Specht, Dantz, Patentanwälte Jöllenbeckerstrasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2002/35] | Loesenbeck, Karl-Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 02000424.8 | 08.01.2002 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | DE2001203055U | 21.02.2001 Original published format: DE 20103055 U | [2002/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1234775 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1234775 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1234775 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/50 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
B65D85/68 (EP);
B65D5/38 (EP);
B65D5/5023 (EP);
B65D2585/6882 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/35] | B65D5/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verpackungskarton für ein im wesentlichen flächenförmiges Verpackungsgut | [2002/35] | English: | Carton for a substantially flat article | [2002/35] | French: | Carton d'emballage pour article de forme essentiellement plane | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 22.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | 05.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.06.2006 | GB | 14.06.2006 | IT | 14.06.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/22] | GB | 14.06.2006 | |
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
FR | 09.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | GB | 14.06.2006 | |
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | GB | 14.06.2006 | |
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2873024 (KOESTER MELVIN C) [X] 1,2,8-11 * figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]US3403778 (JOSEPH VOYTKO, et al) [X] 1,8-11 * column 2, lines 60-65 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 2 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US4162729 (KAISER LOUIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,12 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [Y]DE9409136U (SUEDWESTLB [DE]) [Y] 1-3,12 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0737623 (COCHIS SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3896932 (GIEBEL ERNEST W, et al) [A] 3,4 * abstract * * column 3, lines 9-16 * * figures 1-6 * |