EP1229085 - Water repellent composition, surface-treated substrate, process for its production and article for transport equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2006/46] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoneda, Takashige, Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Furukawa, Yutaka, Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Torimoto, Noriko, Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001003.9 | 16.01.2002 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | JP20010025910 | 01.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001025910 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229085 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1229085 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/00, C09D183/08, C03C17/30, C09K3/18, C09D183/12 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
C09K3/18 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/30 (EP,US);
C09D183/08 (EP,US);
C09D183/12 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08G77/00 (US,EP);
C09D4/00, C08G77/24 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Title | German: | Wasserabweisende Zusammensetzung, oberflächenbehandeltes Substrat , Herstellungsverfahren und Transportgeräte | [2002/32] | English: | Water repellent composition, surface-treated substrate, process for its production and article for transport equipment | [2002/32] | French: | Composition hydrophobe, substrat à surface traitée, procédé de fabrication et matériaux pour équipements de transport | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2006 | CH | 15.11.2006 | CY | 15.11.2006 | FI | 15.11.2006 | IT | 15.11.2006 | LI | 15.11.2006 | NL | 15.11.2006 | TR | 15.11.2006 | IE | 16.01.2007 | LU | 16.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | DK | 15.02.2007 | SE | 15.02.2007 | GR | 16.02.2007 | ES | 26.02.2007 | PT | 16.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
CY | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 16.01.2007 | ||
LU | 16.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 16.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 16.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
SE | 15.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05331455 ; | [A]US3646085 (BARTLETT PHILIP LEE) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0513690 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 3 - line 4 *; | [A]WO9937720 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0703282 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0823406 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * claim 1 * * page 4, line 34 - line 42 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940323), vol. 018, no. 170, Database accession no. (C - 1182), & JP05331455 A 19931214 (SHIN ETSU CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |