EP1229474 - Method and system for providing information pertaining to secondhand articles and machines via a network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Change - representative | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komatsu Ltd. 3-6 Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8414 / JP | For all designated states Bigrental Co., Ltd. 4-16-1, Saikon, Koriyama Fukushima 963-8862 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Komatsu Ltd 3-6 Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8414 / JP | ||
For all designated states Bigrental Co., Ltd. 4-16-1, Saikon, Koriyama Fukushima 963-8862 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Noriaki Komatsu, Ltd., 2-3-6, Akasaka Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8414 / JP | 02 /
Shike, Chikashi Bigrental Co., Ltd., 4-16-1, Saikon Koriyama, Fukushima 963-8862 / JP | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/32] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001113.6 | 24.01.2002 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | JP20010016369 | 24.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001016369 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1229474 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1229474 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren um Informationen über gebrauchte Artikeln und Machinen mittels eine Netzwerks zu vermitteln | [2002/32] | English: | Method and system for providing information pertaining to secondhand articles and machines via a network | [2002/32] | French: | Système et méthode de mise à disposition sur un réseau d'informations concernant des articles et machines vendus en seconde main | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/37] | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000207452 ; | [X]US3754122 (DINAPOLI N, et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 5, line 41 - line 53 * * column 6, line 13 - line 24 * * column 10, lines 8-10 * * column 10, line 29 - line 33 *; | [A]EP0575117 (SPENCER PAUL WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 31 - line 36 * * column 3, line 20 - line 52 *; | [A]US5581464 (WOLL JERRY D [US], et al) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [A]EP0793838 (PEDERSEN HEINE E [DK], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,3 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 7 *; | [PX]EP1172743 (TSUBASA SYSTEM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1 - column 3, line 3 * * column 6, line 30 - line 43 * * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 30 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000207452 A 20000728 (TSUBASA SYSTEM CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * abstract * |