EP1208864 - Improvements in drug delivery devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [2012/23] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Warby, Richard John 93 Church Road Emneth, Norfolk PE14 8 AF / GB | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Rice, Jason Neale GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN 925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Rice, Jason Neale GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2003/23] | Rice, Jason Neale GlaxoSmithKline, Corporate Intellectual Property, 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2002/22] | Pike, Christopher Gerard Pike & Co. Hayes Loft 68A Hayes Place Marlow, Bucks. SL7 2BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02001152.4 | 19.02.1999 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | GB19980003780 | 23.02.1998 Original published format: GB 9803780 | GB19980008804 | 24.04.1998 Original published format: GB 9808804 | GB19980014717 | 07.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9814717 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1208864 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1208864 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208864 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1208864 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, B05D7/24, B65D83/14 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
B65D83/54 (EP);
A61M15/009 (EP);
B05D1/62 (EP);
B65D83/752 (EP);
A61M2205/0222 (EP);
B05D5/083 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/22] | A61M15/00, B65D83/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/37] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen zur Medikamentverabreichung | [2002/22] | English: | Improvements in drug delivery devices | [2002/22] | French: | Dispositifs pour administrer des médicaments | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99905106.3 / EP1066073 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2007
19.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E., et al, et al 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2007
19.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E., et al, et al 3M Deutschland GmbH, Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2007
19.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E., et al, et al Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, 3M Deutschland GmbH, Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2007
19.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE 3M Innovative Properties Comp., 3M Gen.Offices St.Paul P.O. Box 33427 St.Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E., et al, et al Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, 3M Deutschland GmbH, Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | 31.01.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.08.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.10.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.10.2009 | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 29.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 14.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.10.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.10.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.04.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3272442 (ROBERT ALLENBACH CHARLES, et al) [A] 11,12 * column 2, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4252848 (DATTA PABITRA, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5341800 (CLARK ANDREW R [GB], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]WO9628367 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-7,9,10,13 * page 12, paragraph L - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO9632345 (GLAXO WELLCOME INC [US], et al) [A] * page 9, line 6 - line 31 *; | [Y]WO9732672 (POLAR MATERIALS INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-7,9,10,13 * page 5, line 4 - line 28 * * page 9, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO9747347 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 4 - line 14 * | Opposition | WO9632151 |