EP1329243 - Manufacturing method for ski and the ski [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyrolia Technology GmbH Tyroliaplatz 1 2320 Schwechat / AT | For all designated states Pöllmann, Edgar, Ing. Traungasse 1/34 A-1030 Wien / AT | [2006/49] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Tyrolia Technology GmbH Tyroliaplatz 1 2320 Schwechat / AT | ||
For all designated states Pöllmann, Edgar, Ing. Traungasse 1/34 A-1030 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states HTM Sport- und Freizeitgeräte Aktiengesellschaft Tyroliaplatz 1 2320 Schwechat / AT | ||
For all designated states Pöllmann, Edgar, Ing. Traungasse 1/34 A-1030 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pöllmann, Edgar, Ing. Traungasse 1/34 1030 Wien / DE | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Vinazzer, Edith Schönburgstrasse 11/7 1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Vinazzer, Edith, Dipl.-Ing. European Patent Attorney, Schönburgstrasse 11/7 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 02001332.2 | 18.01.2002 | [2003/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1329243 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329243 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/12 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
A63C5/128 (EP);
A63C5/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Skis und Ski | [2003/30] | English: | Manufacturing method for ski and the ski | [2003/30] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de ski et le ski | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 18.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.12.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | FI | 06.12.2006 | GB | 06.12.2006 | IE | 06.12.2006 | NL | 06.12.2006 | TR | 06.12.2006 | LU | 18.01.2007 | BE | 31.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | SE | 06.03.2007 | GR | 07.03.2007 | ES | 17.03.2007 | PT | 07.05.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 06.12.2006 | |
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
GB | 06.12.2006 | ||
IE | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
LU | 18.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
GR | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | DK | 06.12.2006 | |
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
GB | 06.12.2006 | ||
IE | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
GR | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | DK | 06.12.2006 | |
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
GB | 06.12.2006 | ||
IE | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | DK | 06.12.2006 | |
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
GB | 06.12.2006 | ||
IE | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | DK | 06.12.2006 | |
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IE | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 06.12.2006 | |
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IE | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 06.12.2006 | |
IE | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 06.12.2006 | |
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 06.12.2006 | |
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 06.12.2006 | |
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 06.12.2006 | |
SE | 06.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3977688 (IMAGAWA KATSUHIKO) [A] 1,2,6,7,13* the whole document *; | [A]FR2431868 (LOOK SA) [A] 1-3,5-7,10,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5221105 (MAYR BERNHARD [AT], et al) [A] 1-7,10,13 * column W *; | [A]US5836604 (PIEGAY YVES [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,6,10,11 * column W * |