EP1227571 - DC-DC converter and bi-directional DC-DC converter and method of controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu Takase-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8686 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu Takase-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsukawa, Mitsuru Nissin Electric Co., Ltd., 47, Umezu Takase-cho Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8686 / JP | 02 /
Kurio, Nobuhiro Nissin Electric Co., Ltd., 47, Umezu Takase-cho Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8686 / JP | 03 /
Nakagaki, Hitoshi Nissin Electric Co., Ltd., 47, Umezu Takase-cho Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8686 / JP | 04 /
Hasebe, Takaya Nissin Electric Co., Ltd., 47, Umezu Takase-cho Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8686 / JP | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001712.5 | 24.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | JP20010016019 | 24.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001016019 | JP20010305490 | 01.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001305490 | JP20010305491 | 01.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001305491 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1227571 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1227571 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/28 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H02M3/33584 (EP,US);
H02M3/33571 (EP,US);
H02M3/33573 (EP,US);
H02M1/0074 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/31] | H02M3/337 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/22] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gleichspannungswandler , bidirektionaler Gleichspannungswandler und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2002/31] | English: | DC-DC converter and bi-directional DC-DC converter and method of controlling the same | [2002/31] | French: | Convertisseur DC-DC, convertisseur DC-DC bidirectionnel et leur méthode de contrôle | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 28.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/25] | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - STEIGERWALD R L ET AL, "A comparison of high power DC-to-DC soft-switched converter topologies", INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING, 1994., CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 1994 IEEE DENVER, CO, USA 2-6 OCT. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19941002), ISBN 0-7803-1993-1, pages 1090 - 1096, XP010124216 [X] 1-7,10-15,17-19 * page 1091, column R; figure 2 * * page 1094, column R; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.1994.377564 | [A] - PINHEIRO J R ET AL, "Isolated interleaved-phase-shift-PWM de-dc ZVs converters", IEEE2000, (20001008), vol. 4, pages 2383 - 2388, XP010522589 [A] 1,11,14,18 * paragraphs [000I] , [00II]; figures 1,2 * | [A] - MARANESI P ET AL, "Small-signal model of the phase-controlled SILC converter", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, PESC '94 RECORD., 25TH ANNUAL IEEE TAIPEI, TAIWAN 20-25 JUNE 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940620), ISBN 0-7803-1859-5, pages 1034 - 1039, XP010121344 [A] 1,11,14,18 * paragraph [000I]; figures 1a,1b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1994.373807 |