EP1264667 - Control system for robots [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMAU S.p.A. Via Rivalta 30 10095 Grugliasco (Torino) / IT | [2002/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bottero, Aldo Via Guido Reni, 85 10137 Torino / IT | 02 /
Cane, Luciano Via Moriondo, 5 10040 Rivalta (Torino) / IT | 03 /
Cantello, Giorgio Via Campana, 1 bis 10125 Torino / IT | 04 /
Cargnino, Guido Via Tripoli, 124 10137 Torino / IT | 05 /
Zaccagnini, Antonio Corso Giambone, 46/17 10135 Torino / IT | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02001762.0 | 25.01.2002 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | IT2001TO00553 | 08.06.2001 Original published format: IT TO010553 | [2002/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1264667 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1264667 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
B25J9/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Title | German: | Steuerungssytem für Roboter | [2002/50] | English: | Control system for robots | [2002/50] | French: | Système de commande de robots | [2002/50] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/43] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5086400 (HAYATI SAMAD A [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,9,10,12,15 * column 4, lines 28-33 * * column 15, lines 24-26,36-38,39 * * figure 8 * * column 16, lines 2-4,32-36 *; | [Y]GB2256290 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6,13 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 7; figure 1 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 2 * * page 6, lines 7-11; figure 2 ** page 11, lines 11-16 *; | [YA]US5270627 (REHSE DENIS [US]) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, lines 11-13,19-21,38-40; figure 1 * * column 1, lines 5-8; figure 1 * [A] 1; | [X]JPH0973310 (FANUC LTD) [X] 1,4,9,14,15 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP1004408 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, lines 30-37; figure 3 * * column 9, lines 31-35 * * paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * [A] 1; | [XY]EP1026560 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,9-11,15 * column 3, lines 5-11; figures 1,2 * * column 3, lines 32-34 * * column 6, lines 7-11 * * claim 20 * * column 6, lines 41-48 * [Y] 2,3,6,13 | Examination | EP0945228 |