EP1271727 - Electrical installation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEBER AG Sedelstrasse 2 6021 Emmenbrücke / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Weber AG Sedelstrasse 2 6021 Emmenbrücke / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mischon, Daniel Sonnhalde 9 6206 Neuenkirch / DE | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2007/33] | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2003/01] | Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8002 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 02001854.5 | 28.01.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | CH20010001141 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: CH 11412001 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271727 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271727 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/21 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H02B1/21 (EP);
H01H31/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Installationsgerät | [2003/01] | English: | Electrical installation apparatus | [2003/01] | French: | Appareil d'installation électrique | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | IE | 11.01.2012 | IT | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | LU | 28.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | GB | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GB | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GB | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 11.01.2012 | |
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 12.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7322603U (HELMOLD SCHNEIDER) [A] 1* the whole document * |