EP1229061 - Aqueous resin composition, and method of manufacturing a separable fastener using this composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/32] | Aqueous resin composition, and method fo manufacturing a separable fastener using this composition | ||
[2005/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-City Okayama-Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-City Okayama-Pref. / JP | ||
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama-ken 710-0801 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Mitsuru c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd., 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-City, Okayama-Pref. / JP | 02 /
Higashinaka, Yukitoshi c/o Magictape Co., Ltd., 56, Noune Maruoka-Town, Sakai-district, Fukui-Pref / JP | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001934.5 | 31.01.2002 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | JP20010022797 | 31.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001022797 | JP20010046084 | 22.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001046084 | JP20010183140 | 18.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001183140 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229061 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1229061 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08L75/04, A44B18/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
D06M15/564 (KR);
A44B18/0003 (EP,US);
A44B18/0069 (EP,US);
A44B18/0092 (EP,US);
C08L75/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L75/04, C08L33/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/18] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wässrige Harzzusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines trennbaren Verschlusses unter Verwendung dieser Zusammensetzung | [2005/39] | English: | Aqueous resin composition, and method of manufacturing a separable fastener using this composition | [2005/39] | French: | Composition de résine aqueuse et procédé pour la préparation de fermeture séparable en utilisant cette composition | [2002/32] |
Former [2002/32] | Wässrige Harzzusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines trennbaren Verschlusses | ||
Former [2002/32] | Aqueous resin composition, and method fo manufacturing a separable fastener using this composition | Examination procedure | 27.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 08.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.10.2005 | DE | 13.01.2006 | [2007/37] |
Former [2006/52] | DE | 13.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11171956 ; | [A]JPH08259884 ; | [A]JPH11279950 ; | [A]EP0426359 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 13* page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 27; claims 1-22 *; | [X]EP0739069 (ZUMTOBEL LICHT [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 54 - page 6, line 33; examples 1-5; claims 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11171956 A 19990629 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08259884 A 19961008 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11279950 A 19991012 (NICCA CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |