EP1235105 - Planographic printing plate precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Koichi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Miki Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Yamasaki, Sumiaki Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002014.5 | 06.02.2002 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | JP20010038840 | 15.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001038840 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1235105 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1235105 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004, B41C1/10 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
B41C1/1041 (EP,US);
Y10S430/145 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/35] | G03F7/004 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Title | German: | Vorläufer einer lithographischen Druckplatte | [2002/35] | English: | Planographic printing plate precursor | [2002/35] | French: | Précurseur d un plaque lithographique | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 05.04.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000039708 ; | [A]JP2000177260 ; | [A]EP0855267 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 5 - line 10; examples 09-12 *; | [A]EP0903224 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * example - *; | [A]EP0922570 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0938972 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004]; example - * * page 59 *; | [A]EP1031414 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * example - *; | [A]EP1075942 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0053] - [0055] * * paragraphs [0081] , [0093] , [0094] , [0100] , [0102]; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1075941 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * example 1 *; | [PDA]EP1088679 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PDA] 1 * example 13; claim 7 *; | [E]EP1211096 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1* example 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000039708 A 20000208 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000177260 A 20000627 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |