EP1231302 - Apparatus for melt spinning and cooling of bundles of filaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2007/30] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Saurer GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | ||
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Neumag GmbH & Co. KG Christianstrasse 168-170 24536 Neumünster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maas, Lutz Elmhorst 21 23812 Wahlstedt / DE | 02 /
Brandt, Holger Kleinredder 2 24647 Ehndorf / DE | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/16] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/33] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002023.6 | 07.02.2002 | [2002/33] | Priority number, date | DE2001105440 | 07.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10105440 | [2002/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1231302 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/088, D01D5/096 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
D01D5/088 (EP,US);
D01D5/096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [2003/19] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Schmelzspinnen und Kühlen einer Filamentschar | [2002/33] | English: | Apparatus for melt spinning and cooling of bundles of filaments | [2002/33] | French: | Dispositif pour le filage au fondu et refroidissement de faisceaux de filaments | [2002/33] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 17.02.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 01.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/11] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/11] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3708168 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9215732 (SCHWEIZERISCHE VISCOSE [CH]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19653451 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0957187 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A] - STRAUB R ET AL, "QUENCHING SYSTEM FOR MELT SPINING PLANTS", CHEMICAL FIBERS INTERNATIONAL, DEUTSCHER FACHVERLAG, DE, (19950901), vol. 45, no. 5, ISSN 0340-3343, page 372,374,376, XP000527083 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |