EP1231191 - Ceramic material and method of producing the ceramic material from rice bran [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINEBEA Co., Ltd. 4106-73 Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken 3849-2100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Minebea Co., Ltd. 4106-73 Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken 3849-2100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hokkirigawa, Kazuo 3-1-21, Matsugamisaki Yonezawa-shi, Yamagata-ken 992-0053 / JP | 02 /
Obara, Rikuro, Karuizawa Manufacturing Minebea Co.,Ltd., Unit 4106-73 Miyota Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken 3849-2100 / JP | 03 /
Akiyama Motoharu, Karuizawa Manufacturing Minebea Co.,Ltd., Unit 4106-73 Miyota Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken 3849-2100 / JP | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002095.4 | 12.02.2002 | [2002/33] | Priority number, date | JP20010034751 | 13.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001034751 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1231191 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/18, C04B33/13, C04B33/36, C04B18/10, C04B35/622, C04B35/565 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
C04B35/62204 (EP,US);
C04B18/10 (EP,US);
C04B33/132 (EP,US);
C04B33/20 (EP,US);
C04B33/32 (EP,US);
C04B33/36 (EP,US);
C04B35/10 (EP,US);
C04B35/14 (EP,US);
C04B35/18 (EP,US);
C04B35/48 (EP,US);
C04B35/5626 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/583 (EP,US);
C04B35/584 (EP,US);
C04B35/597 (EP,US);
C04B35/62213 (EP,US);
C04B35/6262 (EP,US);
C04B35/6263 (EP,US);
C04B35/6264 (EP,US);
C04B35/6267 (EP,US);
C04B35/6309 (EP,US);
C04B35/6316 (EP,US);
C04B35/63404 (EP,US);
C04B35/63416 (EP,US);
C04B35/638 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3826 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3843 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3847 (EP,US);
C04B2235/386 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3869 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3873 (EP,US);
C04B2235/48 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/604 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6565 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2235/94 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/19] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Keramisches Material und Verfahren zur Herstellung des keramischen Materials aus Reiskleie | [2002/33] | English: | Ceramic material and method of producing the ceramic material from rice bran | [2002/33] | French: | Matériau céramique et méthode pour préparer le matériau céramique utilisant du son du riz | [2002/33] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 30.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/36] | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4981665 (BOECKER WOLFGANG D G [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 7, lines 9-13 * * column 8, line 67 - column 9, line 20; example 8 *; | [A]DE19731653 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]US5916499 (MURAYAMA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 15; example 1 * |