EP1227045 - Blister pack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiwa Gravure Co., Ltd. 7-23, Kinjo 1-chome, Kita-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 462-0847 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Daiwa Gravure Co., Ltd. 7-23, Kinjo 1-chome, Kita-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 462-0847 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibata, Yukihiko Daiwa Gravure Co., Ltd., 7-23, Kinjoh 1-chome Kita-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 462-0847 / JP | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002192.9 | 29.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | JP20010020859 | 30.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001020859 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227045 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227045 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/34 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
B65D75/327 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2003/17] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Blisterverpackung | [2002/31] | English: | Blister pack | [2002/31] | French: | Emballage du type blister | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE1288979 (HAMAC HANSELLA GMBH) [Y] 3 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 34 * [A] 1; | [XY]US5360116 (SCHMILETZKY DIETER [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 1, line 28 - line 37 * * column 9, line 58 - column 10, line 46; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3; | [A]DE4402038 (BORRIES HORST VON [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 59 - column 3, line 24 ** column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 21; figures 5,6 * |