Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
12.05.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.01.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.11.2003 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
06.11.2003 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
17.10.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.07.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
09.07.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
28.05.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
04.04.2003 | First examination report | |
02.04.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
14.03.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
31.01.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
21.06.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] |