EP1228785 - Fall protection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erwin Brand GmbH Haufen 651 9426 Lutzenberg / CH | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Römpler, Aldo Brendenweg 11 Postfach 154 9424 Rheineck / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Römpler, Aldo Schützengasse 34, Postfach 229 9410 Heiden / CH | Application number, filing date | 02002229.9 | 30.01.2002 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | CH20010000196 | 05.02.2001 Original published format: CH 1962001 | [2002/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228785 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A62B1/14 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
A62B1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Title | German: | Absturzsicherung | [2002/32] | English: | Fall protection device | [2002/32] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité antichute | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 03.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 19.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1384582 (HIEBLER ANTON) [X] 1,18 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]FR2348144 (PEST ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1-6,21 * figure - *; | [XA]US4531610 (FERTIER MARCEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,7,18,20 * column 3, lines 59-68 * * column 4, lines 1-7 - column 4, lines 26-28; figure 1 * [A] 8-17; | [A]SU1313456 (KASHEVNIK BORIS L [SU], et al) [A] * figures 1,4 *; | [X]US6155384 (PAGLIOLI LUCA [IT]) [X] 1,7,18,19 * column 2, lines 55-60 - column 2, lines 66,67 * * column 3, lines 1-6 - column 3, lines 44-57; figures 5-7 * |