EP1228763 - Multiparticulate formulations of lithium salts for once-a-day administration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valpharma S.A. Via Ranco, 112 47031 Serravalle / SM | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valducci, Roberto Via del Sole 4 47039 Savignano sul Rubicone (Forli) / IT | 02 /
Alighieri, Tiziano Via Casadei Flavia 24 47900 Rimini / IT | 03 /
Avanessian, Serozh Via Lagomaggio 73/a 47900 Rimini / IT | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Negrini, Elena Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. Studio Ing. Giampaolo Agazzani Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6 40141 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Negrini, Elena Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. & Studio Ing. Giampaolo Agazzani, Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6 40141 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 02002523.5 | 03.02.2002 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | IT2001MI00220 | 05.02.2001 Original published format: IT MI010220 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228763 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/00, A61K9/50, A61K9/28 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61K9/5026 (EP,US);
A61K9/5042 (EP,US);
A61K9/5047 (EP,US);
A61K9/5084 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | 07.02.2003 | LT | 07.02.2003 | LV | 07.02.2003 | MK | 07.02.2003 | RO | 07.02.2003 | SI | 07.02.2003 | Title | German: | Multipartikuläre Formulierungen von Lithiumsalzen zur einmal täglichen Verabreichung | [2002/32] | English: | Multiparticulate formulations of lithium salts for once-a-day administration | [2002/32] | French: | Formulations multiparticulaires à base de sels de lithium pour une administration journaliére monodose | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 01.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2004 | Observations by third parties | 18.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2244485 (ARIES ROBERT [FR]) [X] 1-6,8-12,14,16,18 * claims 1,5-7 * * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 15 * * page 4; example 3 *; | [A]EP0052075 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0396425 (KV PHARM CO [US]) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [X] - RAFIEE-TEHRANI, MORTEZA ET AL, "Formulation of controlled-release lithium carbonate tablets by a fluidized-bed technique", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940725), vol. 121, no. 4, Database accession no. 42626, XP000363223 [X] 1-12,14-18 * abstract * | other | WO0211740 |