EP1231152 - Container for transporting flowers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ebert, Günter Von-Groote-Strasse 30 50968 Köln / DE | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Bayenthalgürtel 15 50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002539.1 | 04.02.2002 | [2002/33] | Priority number, date | DE2001105515 | 07.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10105515 | [2002/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1231152 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1231152 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/50 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
B65D5/5061 (EP);
B65D85/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/33] | Title | German: | Behälter für den Transport von Blumen | [2002/33] | English: | Container for transporting flowers | [2002/33] | French: | Conteneur pour le transport de fleurs | [2002/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 21.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 13.10.2004 | FR | 13.10.2004 | GB | 13.10.2004 | IE | 13.10.2004 | IT | 13.10.2004 | NL | 13.10.2004 | TR | 13.10.2004 | DK | 13.01.2005 | GR | 13.01.2005 | SE | 13.01.2005 | ES | 24.01.2005 | AT | 04.02.2005 | CY | 04.02.2005 | LU | 04.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | PT | 13.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/37] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
IT | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 04.02.2005 | ||
CY | 04.02.2005 | ||
LU | 04.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 04.02.2005 | ||
CY | 04.02.2005 | ||
LU | 04.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 04.02.2005 | ||
LU | 04.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 04.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
AT | 04.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 13.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3481075 (DASTOLI JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1,6,7 * column 6, line 62 - line 68; figures 10,11 *; | [XY]US5115915 (HARRIS CHARLES C [US]) [X] 1,4-9 * column 6, line 1 - line 27; figures 1,2,8,9 * [Y] 2,3; | [YA]FR2671781 (TORTU SARL CHRISTIAN [FR]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * [A] 1; | [A]DE4208618 (FLEURWIND BLUMENVERPACKUNG GMB [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 8, line 10 - line 53; figure 3 *; | [A]US5836450 (GONZALES JUANITA A [US]) [A] 1,5-8 * abstract *; | [AD]DE29910568U (ENSINGER BLUMENHANDEL GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,6-8 * page 6, line 35 - page 7, line 13 * * page 10, line 10 - line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]DE20005610U (KOSS PETRA VON [DE]) [A] 1,4,6* figure 1 * |