EP1238727 - Process for manufacturing metallic strip having differing material properties through their section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Stahl AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2004/50] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Thyssen Krupp Stahl AG August-Thyssen-Strasse 1 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Thyssen Krupp AG August-Thyssen-Strasse 1 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flehmig, Thomas, Dr.-Ing. Annette-Kolb-Strasse 4 40885 Ratingen / DE | 02 /
Blümel, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Brunhildenweg 17 46537 Dinslaken / DE | 03 /
Schmitz, Johann Wilhelm, Dr. Paulskamp 20 52499 Baesweiler / DE | 04 /
Hagemann, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrichstrasse 93 52070 Aachen / DE | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002748.8 | 07.02.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | DE2001107027 | 15.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10107027 | [2002/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1238727 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1238727 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1238727 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06, B22D11/00, B22D11/124 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
B22D11/0622 (EP);
B22D11/00 (EP);
B22D11/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB [2003/41] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von metallischen Bändern mit Abschnitten unterschiedlicher Materialeigenschaften | [2002/37] | English: | Process for manufacturing metallic strip having differing material properties through their section | [2002/37] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de bandes métalliques comportant des propriétés de matériaux différents à travers la section | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0594865 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0650790 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]); | [A]EP0903192 (KVAERNER METALS CONT CASTING [GB]); | [A]DE19840898 (THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG [DE]); | [XD] - RUDOLPHI, ULRICH, Beitrag zur Beurteilung der Qualität von direkt gegossenen Stahlbändern hergestellt nach dem Zweirollen-Bandgiessverfahren, AACHEN, SHAKER VERLAG, XP002219728 [XD] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11-14 * page 26; figure 5.1 * * figure 3.1 * * figure 3.6 * * figure 5.2 * * figure 5.9 * * figure 5.15 * * figure 5.22 * * figure 5.37 * |