EP1232852 - Mould and method for moulding a tyre tread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN RECHERCHE ET TECHNIQUE S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | |||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Sociéte de Technologie Michelin 23 rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aperce, Jean-Claude 34, chemin de la Croix Papillon 63430 Pont-du-Chateau / FR | 02 /
Menard, Gilbert 12, rue de la Garenne 63530 Volvic / FR | 03 /
Merino Lopez, Jose 119, rue St Don 63200 Riom / FR | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Bauvir, Jacques Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bauvir, Jacques Michelin & Cie Service SGD/LG/PI Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 01 / FR | ||
Former [2002/34] | Bauvir, Jacques Michelin & Cie, Service SGD/LG/PI-LAD 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02002957.5 | 11.02.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | FR20010002437 | 20.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0102437 | [2002/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232852 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232852 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/06 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
B29D30/0605 (EP,US);
B29D30/0629 (EP,US);
B29D2030/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Title | German: | Formwerkzeug und Verfahren zum Formen einer Reifenlauffläche | [2002/34] | English: | Mould and method for moulding a tyre tread | [2002/34] | French: | Moule et procédé de moulage d'une bande de roulement | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 31.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2006 | CY | 27.09.2006 | IE | 27.09.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | ES | 07.01.2007 | CH | 28.02.2007 | LI | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | PT | 13.03.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/20] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | IE | 27.09.2006 | |
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 07.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1599772 (KRUSEMARK FREDERICK A) [A] 1 * page 1, line 19 - line 22 * * page 1, line 73 - line 89 *; | [DA]US1733064 (LAMBERT EXECUTRIX HELEN H) [DA] 1* page 1, line 84 - page 2, line 21 *; | [DX]WO9854009 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [DX] 1 * page 19, line 3 - line 26; figure 10 *; | [E]EP1103362 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [E] 1 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037]; figure 3 * |