EP1213900 - Portable telephone set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyashita, Toshikazu NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | Glawe. Delfs. Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002989.8 | 04.05.1995 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | JP19940097193 | 11.05.1994 Original published format: JP 9719394 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1213900 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1213900 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/73 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H04W52/027 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M1/0202 (EP,US);
H04M2250/12 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [2002/24] | Title | German: | Tragbares Telefongerät | [2002/24] | English: | Portable telephone set | [2002/24] | French: | Appareil téléphonique portable | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95106739.6 / EP0682434 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0336856 ; | [A]EP0329399 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 32; figures 1-8 *; | [A]GB2222747 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,2 * page 5, line 19 - page 9, line 5; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO9107836 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 4 - page 8, line 7; figures 1-5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910430), vol. 015, no. 170, Database accession no. (E - 1062), & JP03036856 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |