EP1236907 - Blower with an integrated blower-drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Esa, Hannu Suvantopolku 7 E 41 01600 - Vantaa / FI | [2002/36] | Application number, filing date | 02003076.3 | 13.02.2002 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | DE2001110400 | 03.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10110400 | [2002/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1236907 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F04D25/04 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
F04D25/045 (EP,US);
F01D15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, SE [2003/21] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gebläse mit integriertem Gebläse-Antrieb | [2002/36] | English: | Blower with an integrated blower-drive | [2002/36] | French: | Soufflante avec un eintrainement de ventilateur integre | [2002/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 08.11.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2971333 (PAUL MENDELSOHN JULIAN, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 15 - column 3, line 25 *; | [AD]US3904324 (FLATT JOSEPH, et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4232991 (GAMELL JOSEPH A) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5120194 (NICHOLS JEFFREY [US]); | [AD]US5275533 (KAPICH DAVORIN D [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5427508 (KAPICH DAVORIN [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |